Financial history CHRYSOLIS

Charity number: 1152787
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £55.88k £58.67k £53.01k £54.63k £63.26k
Total expenditure £46.89k £52.68k £60.23k £58.33k £54.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A