Trustees TALKING SENSE!
Charity number: 1151366
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Conrad Bourne | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Evans | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Stanway | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elliot Garbett | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEN UPTON | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|||||
JANE MOORE | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARY ADAMSON | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JO YARNALL | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.