Trustees EAST BEDLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1150904
Charity reporting is overdue by 148 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Wilson | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Leightley | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Scantlebury | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Elizabeth Crosby | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Caroline Forrest | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Smith | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Cuthbertson | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
RONALD STRAUGHAN | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANNE TINDALE | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
RONALD JAMES THORNTON | Trustee | 02 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.