Financial history FUND FOR GLOBAL HUMAN RIGHTS UK

Charity number: 1151043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £525.56k £1.10m £1.57m £2.09m £2.03m
Total expenditure £547.14k £708.19k £1.52m £2.04m £1.99m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £525.56k £1.10m £1.57m £2.08m £2.03m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £12.70k £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £434.55k £567.39k £1.25m £1.68m £1.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £112.60k £140.81k £272.56k £361.52k £200.32k
Expenditure - Governance £8.08k £30.70k £44.86k £45.05k £10.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £764.04k £1.09m £1.18m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0