Trustees NORTHWOOD HOUSE CHARITABLE TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1150641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS ROSELEEN ANN CULLEN Chair 30 January 2013
None on record
Timothy Richard Wander Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Simon Dabell Trustee 19 December 2018
None on record
Diana Deacon Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record
Ben Hicks Trustee 28 August 2014
None on record
Susan Collinge Trustee 18 June 2014
None on record
Dr John Pollard Trustee 24 March 2014
None on record
JANET LEE ALLAN Trustee 30 January 2013
ISLE OF WIGHT LITERARY FESTIVAL
Received: On time
COWES VOLUNTARY COMMUNITY GROUP
Received: On time
COWES HERITAGE AND COMMUNITY GROUP
Received: On time