FARNWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1150233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £249.87k £265.32k £154.11k £268.80k £320.39k
Total expenditure £216.88k £247.99k £156.40k £249.32k £287.06k
Income from government contracts £31.00k £39.03k N/A £36.50k N/A
Income from government grants £47.88k £23.58k £41.30k N/A £20.70k