Trustees LIGHTHOUSE BEACONSFIELD
Charity number: 1151896
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Collins | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Michael | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Slade | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
KERRY SMAJE | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|||||
RACHEL HARMEN | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.