Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, LEIGH (MANCHESTER DIOCESE)

Charity number: 1150800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £135.15k £416.03k £82.14k £60.54k £62.13k
Total expenditure £196.19k £130.03k £92.29k £73.26k £117.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.33k N/A £526 £348