Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES NEW BARNET
Charity number: 1150299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Laura Jane Hewitt | Chair | 03 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Simon Vincent | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Areghan Obawaeki | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Johnson | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Robinson-Beswick | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robinson-Beswick | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Isabella Alison Thompson | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Jean Connah | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUKE RAHUL ALEXANDER COWLES | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PERERA | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALUN DAVID MATTHEWS | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ZOE MIRANDA JONES M MATH ACA | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALICE ADEDEWE FEMI-PEARSE | Trustee | 20 December 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.