Financial history MLD SUPPORT ASSOCIATION UK

Charity number: 1150542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/07/2017 24/07/2018 24/07/2019 24/07/2020 24/07/2021
Total gross income £5.70k £13.44k £14.68k £8.07k £9.25k
Total expenditure £5.62k £14.13k £23.56k £14.54k £13.41k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A