Trustees ELY FOODBANK
Charity number: 1150746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Geoffrey Charles Greenish | Chair | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Amanda Roskell | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Griffin | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Sara Ochieng | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stehpanie Baxter | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Barnes | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
REV Jenny Webb | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
THE VERY REVD MARK BONNEY | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.