Trustees TAYLOR BENNETT FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1150556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Ann Boyd Pinch | Chair | 13 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abbie Samantha Sampson | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcia La-Rose | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lena Ahad | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Syma Cullasy-Aldridge | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marc Eli Cohen | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Oluwatobiloba Ogunleye | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kuldeep Mehmi | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Wall | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.