Trustees CHESHUNT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1150779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN EDWARD GOLLOP | Chair | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Dugdale | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Walter | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Grace Luff | Trustee | 24 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Luff | Trustee | 12 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Fry | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD DURRANT | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
STANLEY JOHN TURNER | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY LOUISA CASSON | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARRY STUART WALLACE | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET WALLACE | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEWART WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN HARRIS | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Sell | Trustee | 22 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN WARDROP | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN EDITH ALLUM | Trustee | 11 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROB SCOTT | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.