Trustees THE DRIFFIELD NAVIGATION TRUST
Charity number: 503430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Shepherdson | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Foreman | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Roy Sutcliffe | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Askin | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hall | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Davies | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christian Jordan | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Hall | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Askin | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cyril Antony Arnott | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Beevers | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Bennett | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE JARVIS | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Stephen Artley | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hood | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Fowler Sutton | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Smith Taylor | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID ARTLEY | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER MARKHAM | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Turton | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM SCHOLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER FRANK GOOCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ROBERT JEFFERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.