Financial history DORRINGTON WESLEYAN REFORM CHAPEL

Charity number: 1150994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £7.97k £8.85k £8.94k £8.40k £9.03k
Total expenditure £7.74k £6.93k £7.15k £8.47k £10.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A