TEAMWORK WYC

Charity number: 1153027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £9.16k £9.72k £10.22k £17.61k £18.57k
Total expenditure £9.16k £9.72k £10.47k £16.59k £17.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A