Accounts and annual returns OPERA LYRICA
Charity number: 1153466
Charity reporting is overdue by 1517 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 56 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 56 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 422 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 422 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 787 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 787 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1152 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1152 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1517 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1517 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window