Trustees LONDON YOUTH CHOIR
Charity number: 1151714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Deirdre May Hutton | Chair | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Nicholas Georgiou | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lucy Margaret Noble | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Kate Victoria Ludlow | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Duncan Stuart Martin Watts | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
George Alexander Wills | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Llewelyn-Jones | Trustee | 19 November 2016 |
|
|||||||
LESLIE CHARLES EAST OBE | Trustee | 14 April 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.