Trustees HAMPSHIRE CRICKET FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1152024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL TRESTRAIL | Chair | 12 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Maximillian Jonas | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Harwood | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donniya Amarjit Davies | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Nicholls | Trustee | 15 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
BENJAMIN JAMES THOMPSON | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
RODERICK GRANVILLE BRANSGROVE | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MANN | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.