EALING LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 1151243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £194.79k £205.59k £264.97k £328.48k £378.07k
Total expenditure £160.43k £212.54k £241.04k £305.37k £375.93k
Income from government contracts £64.74k £105.25k £46.49k £60.87k £5.50k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A