THE MARSDEN RECREATION TRUST

Charity number: 503561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £6.80k £7.69k £8.25k £8.77k £9.10k
Total expenditure £1.79k £1.85k £3.73k £1.46k £2.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A