ALIVE AND KICKING THEATRE COMPANY LTD

Charity number: 1152168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £91.56k £58.20k £76.35k £56.35k £99.34k
Total expenditure £92.14k £70.22k £70.97k £60.47k £90.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.88k £0 N/A £12.00k N/A