Financial history ST BEDE'S FAMILY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.90k £9.81k £10.79k £3.86k £4.52k
Total expenditure £2.97k £1.43k £1.30k £530 £208
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A