ROCK UP AND SING!

Charity number: 1152453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £73.85k £73.85k £68.17k £73.46k £9.61k
Total expenditure £73.87k £73.87k £74.02k £72.35k £7.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A