AQUINAS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1152220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 February 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 February 2021 382 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 February 2021 747 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required