Financial history SHINE (WEST BOWLING)

Charity number: 1153518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £153.83k £161.91k £176.53k £239.06k £184.01k
Total expenditure £126.92k £133.36k £156.49k £227.83k £171.99k
Income from government contracts £5.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.00k