WINCOBANK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 503701
Charity reporting is overdue by 1586 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2004 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008
Total gross income £8.58k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £13.58k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A