Trustees PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF BLACKHEATH PREPARATORY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1152829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicolo Ferrari | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zhenyan Tang | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Damien Orban | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebekah Orban | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bailey | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yashika Lamahewa | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lakhvir Grewal | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nadine Khawaja | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Lisa McBride | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE de GROOT | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH BRAIN | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.