AIMING HIGH LONDON

Charity number: 1152228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £38.91k £131.85k £117.19k £183.99k £146.90k
Total expenditure £28.31k £150.75k £105.37k £178.57k £151.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A