Financial history THE JERMAIN DEFOE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £10.69k £17.12k £71.63k £75.82k £61.15k
Total expenditure £21.83k £12.34k £78.91k £54.81k £40.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A