Trustees HULL UNIVERSITY UNION LIMITED
Charity number: 1152549
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Webb | Chair | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Oluwagbenga Oluwadamilola Onojobi | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Jame Finnis | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ebenezer Aniemeka | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Lilly-Jane Rockett | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Chloe Mae Fenton | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ibrahim Bamidele Raji | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Alexander Duncan | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Scott Barrett-Smith | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
MATTHEW BURMAN LLOYD | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|||||||
Philip Graham Dolling | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Alan Bolchover | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.