Accounts and annual returns SILVER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1152141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 07 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 25 March 2020 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 25 March 2020 49 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window