Trustees BRENTWOOD SCHOOL CIO

Charity number: 1153605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lord BLACK OF BRENTWOOD MA MCIPR FRSA Chair 26 November 2013
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
THE GUILD OF ST BRIDE
Received: On time
Jonathan Peter Wadge Trustee 09 March 2024
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
The Venerable Christopher Mark Burke Trustee 18 November 2023
ST MELLITUS COLLEGE TRUST
Received: 21 days late
THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
Philip Machray Trustee 17 June 2023
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
Dr Mark Fenton Trustee 01 September 2022
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
IDPE
Received: On time
Jason Fergus Trustee 13 March 2021
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
MATTHEW HAMPSON Trustee 14 March 2020
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
Scott Norris Trustee 24 November 2018
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
John Griffith-Jones Trustee 17 March 2018
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
Jasmin Bryan Trustee 17 March 2018
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
Susan Dalgarno Trustee 25 November 2017
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
AMANDA HARDY KC Trustee 26 November 2016
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
ROBERT MCLINTOCK Trustee 13 August 2013
ACTIVE ESSEX FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
ESSEX ATHLETE FOUNDATION
Overdue by 1636 days
PAUL BERESFORD FNAEA Trustee 22 July 2013
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
DAVID ELMS Trustee 22 July 2013
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
JENNY JONES Trustee 22 July 2013
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time
PROFESSOR BRUCE EVANS BSC PHD Trustee 22 July 2013
None on record
JAMES TUMBRIDGE Trustee 22 July 2013
None on record
DR CHRISTOPHER ADAM TOUT MA PHD Trustee 25 April 2013
SIR ANTONY BROWNE'S SCHOOL TRUST, BRENTWOOD
Received: On time