Financial history SALON AND SPA

Charity number: 1152480
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2017 01/05/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020 01/05/2021
Total gross income £21.44k £22.38k £8.03k £6.03k £5.11k
Total expenditure £18.51k £21.32k £6.09k £5.09k £4.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A