Financial history MERTON CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING

Charity number: 1152825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £315.06k £333.18k £402.95k £364.14k £372.82k
Total expenditure £289.73k £349.86k £391.24k £348.91k £353.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £110.00k £121.66k £80.00k £13.33k N/A