Trustees 43RD HUDDERSFIELD (CROSLAND MOOR) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 503768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Tyas | Chair | 01 January 2005 |
|
|
||||
RUKHSANA JAVAID | Trustee | 25 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH BULLETT | Trustee | 25 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELIZABETH HAIGH | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
HELEN PENROSE | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN PENROSE | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA JUNE NELSON | Trustee | 24 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN HARRISON TOPHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.