CHARIS TIWALA

Charity number: 1156850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £45.96k £61.34k £97.64k £72.00k £83.71k
Total expenditure £34.87k £51.08k £71.99k £103.00k £54.91k
Income from government contracts £5.92k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.97k N/A N/A N/A