Financial history THE LEYSDOWN CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1154281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £5.09k £23.72k £34.57k £39.83k £31.81k
Total expenditure £50.88k £35.08k £36.12k £38.34k £39.06k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A