Financial history THE BOOKMARK EDUCATIONAL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1157083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £68.29k £47.84k £52.25k £72.19k £35.84k
Total expenditure £68.22k £51.37k £51.26k £47.20k £60.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £40.29k N/A