ST FRANCIS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1153521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £205.83k £226.34k £184.12k £210.34k £207.33k
Total expenditure £172.37k £206.12k £192.12k £201.71k £232.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £12.00k £3.50k £3.00k £3.00k