WHITLEY BAY FC ACADEMY JUNIORS

Charity number: 1154375
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £37.48k £39.96k £50.50k £86.94k £79.98k
Total expenditure £35.86k £28.60k £52.54k £74.72k £63.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A