Trustees SEDBERGH AND DISTRICT CIO

Charity number: 1154336
Charity reporting is up to date (111 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY JAMES REED SCREEN Chair 07 January 2014
SEDBERGH UNITED CHARITIES AND WIDOWS' HOSPITAL
Received: On time
SEDBERGH PEPPERPOT CLUB
Received: On time
The Parochial Church Council of Sedbergh and Lune
Received: 145 days late
FRANCES MARGARET HAIGH Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Norman Francis Atkins Mr Trustee 12 November 2018
SEDBERGH UNITED CHARITIES AND WIDOWS' HOSPITAL
Received: On time
ANN PARRATT Trustee 11 January 2016
None on record
Dr Myles Philip Ripley Trustee 08 June 2015
None on record
Prof Andrew Howard Cobb Trustee 28 January 2014
NEWTON RIGG LIMITED
Overdue by 13 days
Jennifer Anne Reed Screen Trustee 27 January 2014
None on record