Accounts and annual returns MOVEGB FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153143
Charity reporting is overdue by 1727 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 266 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 266 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 631 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 631 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 996 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 996 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1361 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1361 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1727 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1727 days