Financial history NOBLE CALEDONIA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1153281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £52.49k £72.19k £50.03k £21.71k £33.66k
Total expenditure £41.23k £31.15k £65.93k £85.61k £20.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A