Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, FROGMORE

Charity number: 1154053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Revd Dr Nicholas James Weir Chair 30 September 2015
None on record
Robert Eugene Crawley Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Dr Cynthia Mary Gabriel Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
David Punter Trustee 18 April 2018
ALMSHOUSES FOUNDED BY CARR WIGG AND ELIZABETH ANN OLIVER
Received: On time
Jonathan David Arr Trustee 18 April 2018
None on record
Peter Ward Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
Nigel Jonathan Hunt Trustee 22 April 2015
None on record
Georgina Anne Brown Trustee 22 April 2015
None on record
Dr John Edwards Trustee 02 April 2014
None on record
SHIRLEY ANN WARD Trustee 30 September 2013
None on record
Rev Nigel Andrew Ward Trustee 30 September 2013
None on record
Ruth May Ward Trustee 30 September 2013
None on record