Accounts and annual returns FARINGTON AND DISTRICT SENIOR CITIZENS' SOCIAL AND WELFARE CLUB
Charity number: 503900
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 July 2021 | 12 June 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 July 2020 | 28 March 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 July 2019 | 28 March 2021 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 20 July 2018 | 28 March 2021 | 678 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 July 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window