THE MARY ROSE PERMANENT ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 1152898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.58k £4.47k £6.80k £13.11k £11.93k
Total expenditure £960 £972 £80.97k £85.55k £1.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A