AFRIKAN CHILDREN AND FAMILIES SUPPORT LTD (ACAFS)

Charity number: 1160220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 March 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 February 2017 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required