YESHUOS SHABBOS

Charity number: 1152793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £24.65k £24.29k £6.26k £17.80k £55.41k
Total expenditure £53.20k £26.13k £7.52k £14.44k £60.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A