ST ANNES ON SEA BAPTIST CHURCH YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 503941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 15 June 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 June 2020 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required